judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00242-CR
08-89-00242-CR
07/25/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Garcia, Randall Anthony
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/03/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/11/1998Fee paid
01/18/1995Fee paid
05/21/1993Mandate Issued
05/21/1993Shuck purged
05/21/1993Mandate Issued
02/17/1993Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/17/1993Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/28/1992Fee paid
07/10/1992Submitted
07/10/1992Submission
07/10/1992Submitted
06/26/1992Submission
06/24/1992Case remanded from higher court
06/24/1992Order enteredReversed and Remanded
06/24/1992Case ready to be set
06/24/1992Case remanded from higher court
06/22/1992Case Returned from Higher Court
11/02/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Granted
09/07/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/06/1990Fee paid
08/27/1990Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
08/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review
07/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/25/1990Submitted
06/25/1990Submission
06/25/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
04/02/1990Brief Filed
04/02/1990Case ready to be set
04/02/1990Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
04/02/1990Case ready to be set
03/14/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/31/1990Brief Filed
01/31/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/13/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/07/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
12/01/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/31/1989Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
10/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/20/1989Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989Transcript Filed
09/13/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Order entered
09/08/1989Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
08/31/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
08/31/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
06/29/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/21/1993Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. John B. Holmes
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - AppellantAllen C. Isbell
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
486,198
40 years TDC