judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00264-CR
13-89-00264-CR
07/07/1989
Unknown Criminal Case Type.
Hinojosa, Miguel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/18/1992Letter sent
06/01/1990Mandate Issued
05/23/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
04/23/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
04/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Submission
03/06/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
02/26/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
02/22/1990Submission
12/28/1989Letter sent
09/18/1989Brief Filed
09/18/1989Case ready to be set
08/31/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/31/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/15/1989Miscellaneous Motion
08/15/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/03/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/03/1989Statement of Facts Received
08/03/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/02/1989Sworn Statement filed
07/28/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/27/1989Green card in
07/25/198910 day letter sent
07/18/1989Due date for record to be filed
07/07/1989Transcript Filed
07/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Ronald Yeager