judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00263-CR
13-89-00263-CR
07/07/1989
Other Drug Possession
Smith, Carolyn A.
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/22/1991Mandate Issued
04/12/1991Record checked in
03/06/1991Higher Court DecisionRefused
01/09/1991Cite for opinions
01/09/1991Court of Crim. Appeals Number
12/13/1990Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
12/04/1990XPetition for Discretionary Review
11/26/1990Petition for Review
10/25/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/16/1990Page filed
10/15/1990Motion for rehearing filed
10/04/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/04/1990Motion to extend time to file rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/17/1990Extension of time to file Mo. for Rehear
09/17/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/12/1990Motion for leave to file Supp. Brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
03/29/1990Submitted
03/29/1990Submission
03/28/1990Motion for leave to file SUPP. BRIEF
03/28/1990Opposition filed
03/23/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
03/23/1990Supplemental brief received
02/26/1990Submission
02/06/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/30/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/17/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/11/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/11/1990Submission
01/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/18/1989Additional Copies of Brief
12/15/1989Brief Filed
12/15/1989Case ready to be set
11/30/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/30/1989Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/16/1989Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/24/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Received
10/24/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
10/23/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/23/1989Due date for record to be filed
10/23/1989Motion for leave to file brief
10/19/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/16/1989Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
10/10/1989Appellant's Brief Received
10/03/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/03/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
09/21/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/21/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
09/21/1989Exhibits Filed
09/11/1989Transcript Filed
07/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/22/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Ronald Yeager
7379-1
16 yrs tdc/$4000 fine