judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00316-CV
04-89-00316-CV
07/07/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Canales, Gus T., Et Al, Relators
The Honorable Robert F. Barnes, Respondent
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/1989Motion f/l/file Mandamus DisposedMotion Conditionally Granted
09/18/1989Motion f/l/file Mandamus DisposedMotion Conditionally Granted
09/06/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
08/15/1989Order Entered
08/15/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
08/14/1989Motion for Stay of Mandate Filed
07/28/1989Motion f/l/file Mandamus DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1989Response to Motion Filed
07/10/1989Order Entered
07/07/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
07/07/1989Writ of Mandamus Received
07/07/1989Motion f/l/file Mandamus Filed
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
79th Judicial District Court
Jim Wells
Honorable Robert F. Barnes
24,918
n/a