judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00686-CV
01-89-00686-CV
07/06/1989
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Boring & Tunneling Compnay of America
Hon. Felix Salazar, Judge 157th
Yes
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/1990Filing fee paid
12/28/1989Date final opinion release for publication
12/15/1989Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/30/1989Opinion issuedGrant motion
11/30/1989Opinion issuedGrant motion
10/03/1989Submitted
10/03/1989Submission
10/03/1989Submitted
08/18/1989Supplemental brief filed
07/07/1989Order enteredGrant motion
07/06/1989Motion for leave to file
07/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/08/1989Motion for leave to file
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/15/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRespondentRamon Rosales, Jr.
StateRespondentDavid E. Lueders
StateRelatorTom M. Davis, Jr.
StateRespondentJ. Michael Solar
StateRelatorJoAnn Storey
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris