judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0975-89
PD-0975-89
07/07/1989
PDR Case Type
CASTLEBERRY, LEONARD, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CASTLEBERRY, LEONARDJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Andrew L. Jefferson, Jr.
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00645-CR
Aff 5-25-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
Honorable MARY BACON
487986