judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00631-CV
14-89-00631-CV
07/07/1989
Contract
Mendez, Eva
Ferretiz, Arturo
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/20/1989Case stored
10/12/1989Mandate Issued
10/12/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
10/12/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/12/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/12/1989Mandate Issued
09/14/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
07/07/1989Transcript FILED
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/28/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Al Harrison
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeStephen D. Fox
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
539,674