judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0979-89
PD-0979-89
07/07/1989
PDR Case Type
CARTER, TRAVIS, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/21/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/06/1990FINAL DISPRefused
06/20/1990PDR DISPRefused
07/21/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
CARTER, TRAVISJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Steven H. Swander
Court of Appeals Information:
02-86-00043-CR
Aff 4-20-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
297th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Charles Dickens
0260484R