judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0964-89
PD-0964-89
07/07/1989
PDR Case Type
MEREDITH, WAYNE E.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/31/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1989FINAL DISPRefused
07/31/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/26/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateGilbert D. Douglas
John Holmes
MEREDITH, WAYNE E.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Rokki Ford Roberts
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00539-CR
Aff 5-25-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No 6
Harris
Honorable J. R. MUSSLEWHITE
2392