judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHIPCO INTERNATIONAL VS. STATE, TAXATION

Case Information: 33449
Short Caption:CHIPCO INTERNATIONAL VS. STATE, TAXATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A390648Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/10/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John Peter Lee Ltd--check no. 27249.
12/10/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00316
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/22/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 9/28/98. To Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. 98-00479
12/24/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00506
12/24/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Errata to Request for Transcript of Proceedings 98-00507
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
02/11/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 08/05/99. 99-00966
06/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Substitution of Counsel. Representing appellant: Allf & Rogers, and Nancy L. Allf. 99-05594
06/29/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
10/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 18, 2000. 99-09733
10/21/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 18, 2000. 99-10315
07/12/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-12005
07/12/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-12006
07/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 00-12812
07/25/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.