judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEAN GROMMET, MALINDA GROMMET, husband and wife, and MICHELLE COSTI v. BLAIR NEWMAN, d/b/a NEWMAN REALTY

Case Heading (S-08-0148)
Case Number:S-08-0148Case Docketed On:07/11/2008
Linked To: S-08-0149
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:DEAN GROMMET, MALINDA GROMMET, husband and wife, and MICHELLE COSTI v. BLAIR NEWMAN, d/b/a NEWMAN REALTY
Full Title:DEAN GROMMET, MALINDA GROMMET, husband and wife, and MICHELLE COSTI, Appellants (Defendants), v. BLAIR NEWMAN, d/b/a NEWMAN REALTY, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDean GrommetPatrick J. Murphy
Thomas Stine Peters
AppellantMalinda GrommetPatrick J. Murphy
Thomas Stine Peters
AppellantMichelle CostiPatrick J. Murphy
Thomas Stine Peters
AppelleeBlair NewmanMichael E. Warren

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Contracts
Opinion Number:2009 WY 150
Citation:220 P.3d 795

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/28/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/08/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from Mr. Murphy requesting that oral argument be held until December.EventPhone CallFinal
10/17/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2008Event - Hardcopy received - appellants' reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/23/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, trial transcript; Volume V, exhibits; Volume VI, depositions.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for Grommet, et al.; and Micahel Warren for Newman.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas S. Peters for appellants Grommet, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/09/2008Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
12/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' motion for Court to Consider and take Judicial NoticeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/15/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - Proposed OrderNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court ( Patrick J. Murphy, Thomas Stine Peters, argued by Mr. Murphy for appellants; Michael E. Warren for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/30/2008Order - Denying Motion to Take Judicial NoticeOrderDenyFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
01/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Counsel's Correction of Mis-Statement at Oral ArgumentsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/10/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in S-08-0148 and reversing and remanding in S-08-0149, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal