judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TRACY WHITE V. ADAM DOYLE

Case Information: 10-CV-1312
Short Caption:TRACY WHITE V. ADAM DOYLEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB7378-10Filed Date:10/13/2010

Opening Event Date:10/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/21/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTracy White NPro SeN
AppelleeAdam Doyle N
Malinda Lawrence NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/28/2010MOT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE STMT RE TRANSCRIPT
12/02/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 13, 2010, and appellant's motion for extension of time to file the statement regarding transcript, to which no opposition has been filed, it is (MORE)
12/02/2010 ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the statement regarding transcript is granted and the statement regarding transcript shall be filed within 20 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. (JAC) elp
12/30/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
12/30/2010DISMISSED
01/03/2011RECEIVED #1sr (49-pgs/tape 6/22/10) #2sr (150-pgs/tape 6/23/10 proc.) #3sr (92-pgs/tape 6/24/10 proc.)w/cd
01/06/2011RECEIVED- record index
01/21/2011MANDATE ISSUED