judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00222-CR
08-89-00222-CR
07/07/1989
Theft
Garcia, Jessie
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
11/08/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/1989Mandate Issued
11/08/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
11/08/1989Mandate Issued
11/08/1989Submission
11/08/1989Submitted
11/08/1989Case ready to be set
10/27/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/25/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
10/06/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
09/28/1989Transcript Filed
07/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/08/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Steve W. Simmons
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Russell M. Aboud
Trial Court Information
41st District Court
El Paso
Honorable Mary Anne Bramblett
44081
10 yrs. TDC