judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0967-89
PD-0967-89
07/07/1989
PDR Case Type
PERKINS, EDWARD CHARLES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/25/1990SUPP BR FILEDState
12/04/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
11/03/1989BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/1991MANDATE ISSD
06/26/1991OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
05/09/1990SUBMITTED
04/25/1990SUPP BR FILED
02/09/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
12/04/1989BRIEF FILED
11/03/1989BRIEF FILED
10/04/1989PDR DISPGranted
08/08/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1991STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
PERKINS, EDWARD CHARLESApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Mr. Mark A. Goldberg
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00258-CR
Rev & Rem 5-4-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No 14
Harris
Honorable JAMES N. BARKLEY
971891