judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00171-CR
12-89-00171-CR
07/07/1989
Robbery
Wilmeth, Gene
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/19/1991
06/17/1991Mandate Issued
05/30/1991
05/15/1991
04/30/1991Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/30/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/28/1991Submitted
03/28/1991Submission
02/13/1991Submission
01/03/1990
12/07/1989Brief Filed
12/07/1989Case ready to be set
10/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/20/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/27/1989Brief Filed
08/24/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/24/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/27/1989No Description Available.
07/24/1989
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/03/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/03/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
04/07/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/17/1991RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
06/19/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wilmeth, Gene EdwardCriminal - AppellantMr. Sam R. Hicks
Texas, State OfCriminal - State of TexasMr. Jeffrey Herrington
Trial Court Information
3rd District Court
Anderson
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
20009
20 yrs. TDC/$5,000 fine