judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00803-CV
05-89-00803-CV
07/07/1989
Contract
Rahimi, Parviz
Ray A. Hallford, d/b/a Joe Gallini Co., David Mottahedeh,dba
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/23/1997Record RetentionDestroy
08/16/1990Mandate Issued
08/16/1990Mandate Issued
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/02/1990Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/01/1990Notice Filed
05/01/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
05/01/1990Submitted
03/26/1990Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1990MattConv
03/12/1990Motion to Withdraw Attorney
02/12/1990Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/1990Motion to Withdraw Attorney
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
12/04/1989Brief Filed
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/16/1989Response to Motion
11/06/1989Brief Filed
11/06/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/06/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/11/1989Brief Filed
08/24/1989Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/11/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
08/11/1989Mot Ext Time File Sup Sfacts
08/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/17/1989MattConv
07/12/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/07/1989Transcript Filed
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/12/1989Appeal Bond Filed
03/14/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
296th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Verla S. Holland
296-811-88