judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0994-89
PD-0994-89
07/10/1989
PDR Case Type
HUBBARD, BOBBY LEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
11/01/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
10/13/1989REHEAR FILED
10/02/1989REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
10/02/1989REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/09/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/10/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/02/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hubbard, Bobby LeeApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Bobby Lee Hubbard
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-82-00719-CR
Aff 3-31-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
265th District Court
Dallas
Honorable JOHN OVARD
F82-75082-SIR