judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00327-CR
04-89-00327-CR
07/07/1989
Burglary
Moore, Marc
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/1990Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
09/28/1990Mandate Issued
09/28/1990Mandate Issued
07/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/17/1990Submitted
07/17/1990Submission
07/17/1990Submitted
06/04/1990Submission
03/14/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1990Case ready to be set
03/13/1990Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
03/13/1990Brief Filed
03/13/1990Case ready to be set
03/08/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/23/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
02/13/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/31/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/05/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Brief Filed
01/03/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/08/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/04/1989No Description Available.
11/21/1989No Description Available.
11/21/1989No Description Available.
09/28/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989No Description Available.
07/27/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
07/25/1989No Description Available.
07/21/1989No Description Available.
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/25/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/28/1990Case StoredCase stored
09/28/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
88-CR-2971-A
15 years TDC