judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00799-CR
05-89-00799-CR
07/07/1989
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Hulsey, Dueal Ray
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/1991Mandate Issued
07/05/1991Mandate Issued
05/13/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/1991Letter received
03/21/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
03/19/1991Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
03/11/1991Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/27/1991Motion to Substitute Attorney
02/15/1991Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
02/15/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/15/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/13/1990Submission
11/13/1990Submitted
11/13/1990Submission
11/13/1990Submitted
09/19/1990MattConv
06/15/1990Brief Filed
06/11/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/07/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/25/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/23/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/23/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/29/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/28/1990Brief Filed
03/28/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/23/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/05/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/19/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/05/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/27/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/25/1989Transcript Filed
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/29/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/05/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
F88-94442-S
23 yrs TDC