judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00690-CR
01-89-00690-CR
07/07/1989
Robbery
Lawrence Jr., Link
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/19/1989Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
07/19/1989Transcript filed
07/13/1989Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/03/1989Notice of appeal filed
04/24/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
StateCriminal - AppellantNeely C. Lewis
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
18,421-85
99 yrs tdc