judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROSARIO QUEL BAUTISTA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1357
Short Caption:ROSARIO QUEL BAUTISTA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1492-10Filed Date:10/27/2010

Opening Event Date:10/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRosario Quel Bautista Y
Sandi S. Rhee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. MannarinoNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sandi Rhee, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/09/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sandi Rhee, Esquire
12/28/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 9, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (73 pgs/Tape - 10/26/10 proc.)(w/CD)
01/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/07/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
01/07/2011RECEIVED - statement re transcript.
01/19/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
01/19/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
03/03/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 19, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/04/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 3, 2011, which directed appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, within 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (ETW)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/16/11. no oppo
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 16, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 26, 2011 (no oppo)
06/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed)
06/06/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix
06/14/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motions are granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/14/2011APPENDIX
07/14/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
07/19/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/18/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/18/2011FiledAffirmed
11/09/2011FiledMandate