judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANIGAN (KIMBALL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31360
Short Caption:BRANIGAN (KIMBALL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C133325Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/13/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/13/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
12/10/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Re: Records on appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district curt shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31294, 31312, 31359, 31360, 31362, 31363, 31399, 31400, 31403, 31464.
04/16/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2.
04/16/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/24/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Proper Person NRAP 46(b). (Received original and 3 copies-1 copy returned).
12/04/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-21128
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21236
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. 00-21236