judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN W. MITCHELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0187)
Case Number:S-08-0187Case Docketed On:08/27/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEVEN W. MITCHELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN W. MITCHELL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven W. Mitchell Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/28/2008Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from Mr. Mitchell requesting docket number and for us to request record.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/28/2008Correspondence - Outgoing. Sent letter to Mr. Mitchell responding to his letter. Stated that we had sent him a docketing letter yesterday and that we wouldn't request the record until briefing was completed.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
09/02/2008Motion - Appointment of counsel and expert witnessMotionAppointment of counselFinal
09/03/2008Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/09/2008Correspondence - Incoming other - letter to Chief Justice Voigt and copy of letter from appellant to District Court JudgeCorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
09/10/2008Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter to appellant regarding brief and returned briefs without filing.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
09/19/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal