judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ECHEMENDIA (RICARDO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31359
Short Caption:ECHEMENDIA (RICARDO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138429Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/13/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/13/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/13/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
12/10/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31294, 31312, 31359, 31360, 31362, 31363, 31399, 31400, 31403, 31464.
04/13/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 & 2.
04/13/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-19436
12/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19636
12/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2000. 00-19636