judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1400
B-1400
02/28/1969
Application for Writ of Error
ELIZABETH BROWN GOSSETT, ET AL.
FELMONT OIL CORPORATION, TIDEWATER ASSOCIATED OIL COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/09/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/27/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/14/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/28/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/15/1969Response to Motion filed
07/09/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/27/1969Response to Petition
03/14/1969Response to Petition
02/28/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/28/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tidewater Associated Oil Company, et al.Respondent
Felmont Oil CorporationRespondent
Elizabeth Brown Gossett, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information