judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6135
B-6135
07/07/1976
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT WILLIAM FORD, JR., ET AL.
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/03/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
07/07/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/21/1977Response to Motion filed
03/17/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/02/1977Opinion issued
03/02/1977Dissenting opinion issued.
10/13/1976Document received (See Remarks)
10/13/1976Document received (See Remarks)
08/03/1976Response to Petition
07/07/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/07/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert William Ford, Jr., et al.Petitioner
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information