judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6127
B-6127
07/06/1976
Application for Writ of Error
META GERFERS GRUNDNYER, ET AL.
NICK MCFADIN AND PAUL E. CASSEB
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/03/1976Response to Reply filedRespondent
08/18/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/21/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
07/06/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1976Response to Motion filed
12/06/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/14/1976Letter Filed
09/03/1976Response to Reply filed
08/18/1976Reply to Response
07/21/1976Response to Petition
07/06/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/06/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Meta Gerfers Grundnyer, et al.Petitioner
Nick McFadin and Paul E. CassebRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information