judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RUFFIN (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36330
Short Caption:RUFFIN (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35134 , 40055 , 40513 , 41162 , 45598 , 46273 , 52049 , 52193 , 55606 , 57595
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 99C158018Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10689
06/22/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 18, 2000, January 19, 2000, January 20, 2000 and January 21, 2000. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 00-10690
07/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Due Dates: Appoint counsel 30 days. Otherwise appellant must retain counsel within 30 days and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. From appointment or appearance: enter appearance 10 days. fn1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court.] 00-12394
08/07/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appointment of Counsel. Certified copy of notice from Clark County Clerk filed in district court on August 2, 2000 enclosing a copy of minute order. Bob Miller, Deputy Public Defender, appointed as counsel for appellant on August 2, 2000. 00-13626
08/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Robert L. Miller, Deputy Public Defender. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-13894
08/31/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/4/99 (Maureen Schorn), 6/8/99 (Cathy Nelson), 6/10/99 (Cathy Nelson), 7/19/99 (Cathy Nelson), 9/1/99 (Cathy Nelson), 11/4/99 (Cathy Nelson), 11/18/99 (Cathy Nelson), 1/18/00-1/21/00 (Sharleen Nicholson) and 6/5/00 (Sharleen Nicholson). To Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn, Cathy Nelson and Sharleen Nicholson. 00-15416
08/31/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-15417
09/01/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Amended). Transcripts requested: 6/4/99 (Maureen Schorn), 6/8/99 (Cathy Nelson), 6/10/99 (Cathy Nelson), 7/19/99 (Cathy Nelson), 9/1/99 (Cathy Nelson), 11/4/99 (Cathy Nelson), 11/18/99 (Cathy Nelson), 1/18/00-1/21/00 (Sharleen Nicholson) and 6/5/00 (Sharleen Nicholson). To Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn, Cathy Nelson and Sharleen Nicholson. 00-15513
09/11/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 8, 1999, June 10, 1999, July 19, 1999, September 1, 1999 and November 18, 1999. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 00-15974
09/18/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 18, 19, 20, 21, 2000; June 5, 2000. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 00-16414
09/25/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 4, 1999. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 00-16875
10/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporters Nelson and Nicholson have filed certified copies of the transcripts requested of them. To date, court reporter Schorn has not filed the transcript requested of her. Court reporter Schorn shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcript of proceedings conducted on June 4, 1999, to file a motion for an extension of time to do so, or to inform this court in writing why the requested transcript cannot be produced. 00-17873
10/20/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 4, 1999. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 00-18641
11/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 12, 2000, this court received a proper person letter from appellant, Kevin Tyrone Ruffin, requesting this court to order new counsel appointed for his direct appeal due to a conflict of interest. We note that Mr. Ruffin has neither sought nor been granted leave to file documents with this court in proper person. We elect to treat Mr. Ruffin's letter as a motion for reappointment of counsel. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall forthwith file Mr. Ruffin's letter received on October 12, 2000. On July 31, 2000, the district court ordered Public Defender, Robert L. Miller, confirmed as counsel for Mr. Ruffin's direct appeal. In his letter, Mr. Ruffin argues that since the Clark County Public Defender's Office could not confirm representation at trial due to an actual conflict of interest with a co-defendant, they should not be appointed as counsel for him for his direct appeal. The clerk of this court shall forthwith forward a copy of Mr. Ruffin's letter to the Clark County Public Defender's Office. fn1[The clerk of this court shall also include a copy of the district court minutes for the proceedings conducted on November 10, 1999.] The Clark County Public Defender's Office shall have 30 days from the date of this order to review the letter and notify this court, in writing, whether or not there is a conflict of interest that would prevent them from representing Mr. Ruffin in his direct appeal. As we have referred Mr. Ruffin's letter to the Clark County Public Defender's Office, we decline to take further action in regard to Mr. Ruffin's letter at this time. 00-19303
11/03/2000Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter: Conflict with Public Defenders. 00-18114
11/03/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Clark County Public Defender with a copy of the proper person letter filed on November 3, 2000 and a copy of the district court minutes for the proceedings conducted on November 10, 1999.
12/11/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 7, 2001. 00-21607
12/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (to file response to 11/3/00 order). 00-21628
01/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-00491
01/11/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including January 17, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 01-00604
01/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 12, 2000, this court received a proper person letter from appellant, Kevin Tyrone Ruffin, requesting this court to order new counsel appointed for his direct appeal due to a conflict of interest. On December 11, 2000, appellant's appointed counsel, Deputy Public Defender Robert L. Miller, filed a motion for an extension of time to file the required response. We grant attorney Miller's motion for an extension of time. Included in the motion was attorney Miller's affidavit in response to our November 3, 2000, order. We conclude that there is no conflict of interest. Although appellant has neither sought nor been granted permission to file documents in proper person, we elect to treat Mr. Ruffin's letter, received on October 12, 2000, as a motion for reappointment of counsel. As we have concluded that there is no conflict of interest, we deny appellant's request for appointment of new counsel. 01-01037
01/24/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-01597
01/26/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed January 24, 2001, is granted. The clerk shall file the opening breif and appendix received on January 24, 2001. 01-01729
01/26/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: no postmark. 01-01598
01/26/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-01600
02/12/2001MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Pro Per Motion for Leave. 01-02778
02/23/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-03429
03/22/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 24, 2001. 01-05081
07/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 12, 2001, appellant Kevin Tyrone Ruffin submitted a proper person motion for leave to file a proper person supplemental brief. Because we review his motion on the merits, we direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's motion received on February 12, 2001. Appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal. We deny appellant's motion for leave to file a proper person supplemental brief. On February 12, 2001, March 13, 2001, and April 17, 2001, appellant submitted proper person letters to this court concerning issues he wishes raised on appeal. Because we deny appellant's motion to proceed in proper person, we direct the clerk of this court to return appellant's letters, unfiled. Because appellant is represented by counsel, appellant should address all concerns regarding this appeal directly to counsel. To date appellant has not filed the reply brief. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief, if deemed necessary. Failure to timely file a reply brief will be treated as a waiver of the right to file a reply brief. 01-11671
07/11/2001MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Pro Per Motion for Leave. 01-02778
07/11/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Kevin T. Ruffin. Returned unfiled, the original proper person letters received February 12, 2001, March 12, 2001, and April 17, 2001.
11/19/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn8[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19278
12/17/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19514
12/17/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2001. 01-19514