judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: NATHAN EDMONDS, APLT.

Case Information: 10-FM-1372
Short Caption:IN RE: NATHAN EDMONDS, APLT.Classification:Appeals - Family - Mental Health
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MHE1363-09Filed Date:11/01/2010

Opening Event Date:11/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/20/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/06/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNathan Edmonds, Jr.Y
Herbert A. WilfertYN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonNY
Stacy L. AndersonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Herbert A. Wilfert, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (63 pgs/tape) 5/10/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8 pgs/tape) 3/10/10 proc. p.m.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (10 pgs/tape) 5/17/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (48 pgs/tape) 9/15/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (362 pgs/Ronan) 9/27-30/10 proc.
12/17/2010RECORD INDEX
12/17/2010RECORD COPIES
12/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 3/10/10 5/10/10 5/17/10 9/15/10 9/27-30/10 (rt. needed)
12/20/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 1, 2011 (unopposed)
02/18/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 1, 2011. (JAC)
03/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 21, 2011 (unopposed)
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 21, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for one-day (unopposed)
03/22/2011RECEIVED - Brief of Appellant and Appendix
03/30/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension fo time within which to file the brief, and the lodged limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix. (ETW)
03/30/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/30/2011APPENDIX
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file amended aplt's brief no oppo
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to give additional time to the Governmnet to file response brief to the amended brief.
05/10/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION and the amended brief shall be filed on or before May 23, 2011. It is F/O that appellee's brief shall be field within 30 days from the date the amended brief is filed with this court. (JAC)
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
06/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days.
07/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 8/29/11.
08/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief 45 Days (Appellee)Granted
09/22/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellee's Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief 45 Days (Appellee) 10/13/11
09/22/2011FiledOpposition to Motion for Forty-Five More Days to File Brief (Appellant)
10/13/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/13/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief until November 23, 2011 (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/10/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Denied
02/15/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for oral argument.
03/06/2012FiledSubmitted To Oberly,Easterly,King
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Easterly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
05/18/2012FiledMandate