judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6141
B-6141
07/12/1976
Application for Writ of Error
RAY CONSTANCE
GRACE CAROL CONSTANCE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/29/1976Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/03/1976Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/12/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/29/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/15/1976Opinion issued
09/29/1976Document received (See Remarks)
09/29/1976Document received (See Remarks)
09/29/1976Document received (See Remarks)
09/03/1976Supplemental Brief filed
07/12/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/12/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ray ConstancePetitioner
Grace Carol ConstanceRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information