judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: SAMUEL N. OMWENGA

Case Information: 10-BG-1352
Short Caption:IN RE: SAMUEL N. OMWENGAClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Miscellaneous
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN204-05, ET ALFiled Date:11/04/2010

Opening Event Date:11/04/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Catherine Kello NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentSamuel N. Omwenga NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/04/2010PETITION FOR TEMPORARY SUSPENSION of Bar Counsel on behalf of the Board on Professional Responsibility, for order of temporary suspension.
11/04/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file two exhibits to the verified petition under seal.
11/04/2010RECEIVED Second address for respondent: 13010 Firestone Court, Silver Spring, MD 20904.
12/02/2010FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/02/2010GRANTED On consideration of the petition of Bar Counsel, on behalf of and at the direction of the Board on Professional Responsibility (the Board), pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 3 (c), for a temporary suspension of respondent, Samuel N. Omwenga, a member of the Bar of the District of Columbia; Bar Counsel's verified motion before the Board, with attachments, requesting that the Board petition this Court for an order temporarily suspending respondent; the Board's order directing Bar Counsel to file the petition supported by an affidavit showing that respondent appears to pose a substantial threat of serious harm to the public; and the affidavit of the Assistant Bar Counsel; and Bar Counsel's motion for leave to file three exhibits to the verified petition under seal; it is ORDERED that Bar Counsel's motion is granted and the Clerk is directed to file Exhibit 2 and the confidential appendices to Exhibit 3 and Exhibit 4 to the Verified Petition under seal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the petition is granted and respondent Samuel N. Omwenga is hereby temporarily suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia, effective immediately, on the ground that he appears to pose a substantial threat of serious harm to the public, based upon allegations of serious misconduct, including intentional misappropriation of client funds, dishonesty, conduct seriously interfering with the administration of justice, and other ethical misconduct; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent Samuel N. Omwenga is required to disclose to the Board and Bar Counsel within ten (10) days of the date of this order the identity of all accounts where he maintains funds subject to Rule 1.15 (a) of the District of Columbia Rules of Professional Conduct (Rule 1.15 (a)); and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Samuel N. Omwenga's maintenance and use of such accounts is restricted to the extent that, effective immediately upon service of this order upon Samuel N. Omwenga, and until further order of the Court, he (1) shall comply fully with the requirements of Rule 1.15 (a), and (2) shall disburse funds subject to the rule only with the prior approval and co-signature of such member of the Bar as the Board may designate to serve as financial monitor; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall serve copies of this order upon respondent Samuel N. Omwenga, and upon each financial institution in which he is known or believed to maintain funds subject to Rule 1.15 (a), such order to serve as an injunction barring each financial institution so served from making payments from the account on any obligation except with the prior approval and co-signature of the financial monitor referred to in the proceeding paragraph of this order; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of Bar Counsel shall identify a financial monitor to the Board who is available and will to serve in this matter; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent Samuel N. Owenga shall comply fully with the provisions of D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 3 (c)(1), concerning (1) the acceptance of new cases and other legal matters, and (2) the deposit, in a trust account complying with the provisions of Rule 1.15 (a), of any and all gees tendered at any time after service of this order upon him; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent Samuel N. Omwenga's attention is drawn to the requirements of D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14, relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c), dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (RD,BR,NW)
12/16/2010RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of non filing by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.
09/08/2011FiledAffidavit of respondent (Respondent)
11/14/2011LodgedLetter From the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court of noncompliance by the respondent of the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)