judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANDON W. MORRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0177)
Case Number:S-08-0177Case Docketed On:08/18/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:SANDON W. MORRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SANDON W. MORRIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSandon W. MorrisDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 88
Citation:210 P.3d 1101

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/18/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - Index from district court clerkNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
10/06/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/18/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellee and received copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts (contains word index & exhibits).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/10/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Hill writing for the court. Justice Golden writes separately concurring in part, dissenting in part.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/14/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion signed for by agent for Warden on 7/13/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/20/2009Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Certified copy of Order Rescinding Order Revoking Probation from District Court.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate signed for 7/29/09 by agent for Warden of Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/03/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal