judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5547
B-5547
09/29/1975
Application for Writ of Error
LEONARD C. HANES
BILLY L. WALKER, SR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/10/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/29/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
09/29/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/19/1975Response to Motion filed
12/10/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/29/1975Response to Petition
10/13/1975Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
09/29/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/29/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Billy L. Walker, Sr.Respondent
Leonard C. HanesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information