judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1234-89
PD-1234-89
09/07/1989
PDR Case Type
BREESE, MICHAEL ROBERT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/29/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/10/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BREESE, MICHAEL ROBERTApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Ross Teter
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
08-89-00130-CR
Rev & Rem 6-21-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
203rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable THOMAS B. THORPE
F83-99636-HP