judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1241-89
PD-1241-89
09/07/1989
PDR Case Type
TINNEY, WILLIAM DAVID
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/02/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/02/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TINNEY, WILLIAM DAVIDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
Court of Appeals Information:
02-88-00066-CR
Aff 5-17-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2
Tarrant
Honorable L. CLIFFORD DAVIS
0295910A