judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1240-89
PD-1240-89
09/07/1989
PDR Case Type
JAXSON, RICHARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/23/1990SUPP BR FILEDState
06/25/1990SUPP BR FILEDAppellant
03/05/1990BRIEF FILEDState
01/29/1990BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/10/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/14/1990MANDATE ISSD
11/28/1990OPINION ISSDDismissed as improvidently granted
07/23/1990SUPP BR FILED
06/25/1990SUPP BR FILED
06/22/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
06/22/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
06/13/1990SUBMITTED
06/12/1990MOTIONGranted
06/12/1990MOTION FILED
04/18/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
03/05/1990BRIEF FILED
01/29/1990BRIEF FILED
01/10/1990EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
01/10/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
12/13/1989PDR DISPGranted
10/10/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/18/1989EXT RESPONSE DISPGranted
09/18/1989EXT RESPONSE FILED
09/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/14/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTravis S. Ware
Jaxson, RichardApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Daniel W. Hurley
Court of Appeals Information:
07-87-00279-CR
Aff 6-29-89
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
137th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable CECIL G. PURYEAR
86-405,280