judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YAKIMA SUPPLIES, INC. V. MILTON MORRIS

Case Information: 10-CV-1334
Short Caption:YAKIMA SUPPLIES, INC. V. MILTON MORRISClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-0673 Consolidated:10-CV-1334, 11-CV-0195
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1728-09Filed Date:10/25/2010

Opening Event Date:10/25/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/24/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantYakima Supplies Inc.N
AppelleeMilton Morris N
M. Celeste BruceNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/24/2010 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these maters, and it appearing that a briefing order has already been issued in appeal No. 10-CV-673, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for appeal no. 10-CV-1334, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CV-673 and 10-CV-1334 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall transmit the record index for appeal no. 10-CV-1334 forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the briefing order issued in appeal No. 10-CV-673 is hereby amended and appellant's consolidated brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (ETW) elp
12/01/2010RECORD INDEX 10cv1334
12/01/2010FiledRECORD COMPLETED
01/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 6, 2011 (unopposed) *Appellee's counsel is taking no position to the motion (elp)
01/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 1/10/11.
01/10/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix
01/20/2011 On consideration of appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the brief and the appendix, to which no oppositions have been filed, and the lodged brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motions are granted and the lodged brief of appellant and the appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
01/20/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/20/2011APPENDIX
01/20/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before February 14, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/14/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/14/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/25/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
03/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE appeal nos. 10-CV-673 and 10-CV-1334 with 11-CV-195 and combine opening and reply briefs
03/22/2011APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to Appellant's Motion to Consolidate.
03/31/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion to consolidate appeals and to combine reply brief in appeals nos. 10-CV-673 & 10-CV-1334 and the opening brief in appeal no. 11-CV-195, and the response thereto, and it appearing that transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-195, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion to consolidate is granted and appeal no. 11-CV-195 is consolidated without previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-673 & 10-CV-1334 for all purposes. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' motion to combine reply brief and opening brief in 11-CV-195 is granted to the extent that, in appeal no. 11-CV-195, a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts as required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (ETW) elp
06/28/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
07/26/2011FiledRecord Index (11cv195)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2 (9-pg/tape 9/26/08 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (31-pgs/tape 4/28/09 proc.
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #4 (17-pgs/tape 8/7/09proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 (44-pgs/johnson 1/13/10 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record#6(25-pgst/tape 10/14/10 proc.)
08/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #7 (37-pgs/tape 7/23/10 proc.)w/cd
08/08/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in 10-CV-673 & 10-CV-1334 to October 19, 2011. Appendix, Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/19/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw as counsel in these consolidated appeals. (Appellant)Granted
09/22/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's attorney motion to withdraw (Appellant)
09/28/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion for extension of time and to withdraw as counsel and aple's motion motion to dismiss consolidated appeals (Appellee)
10/03/2011FiledReply of Appellant's Counsel to opposition to motion to withdraw (Atty Francis)
10/05/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File second oppo to E.P. Francis motion (Appellant) filed by (David Kiss, aplt)Granted
10/11/2011FiledOpposition to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Appeals (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledReply of Appellants to Appellee's Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief (Appellant)
10/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in 10-CV-673 & -1334 and the opening brief in 11-CV-195 by 21 days after the Court rules on the motion to withdraw. (Appellant)Granted
11/22/2011FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw as counsel in these consolidated appeals. (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File second oppo to E.P. Francis motion (Appellant) filed by (David Kiss, aplt)
11/22/2011FiledOpposition 2nd oppo to attorney's motion to withdraw (filed by: David Kiss, aplt) (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledReply to Appellee's Opposition to Motion of Appellant's Counsel to Withdraw as Counsel (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledOrder directing appellant Yakima Supplies, Inc. in appeals nos. 10-CV-673 and 10-CV-1334 to provide this court with the identity of its new counsel within 15 days from the date of the order.
11/22/2011FiledOrder directing appellant David Kissi in appeal no. 11-CV-195 to provide this court with the identity of his new counsel within 15 days from the date of this order
11/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in 10-CV-673 & -1334 and the opening brief in 11-CV-195 by 21 days after the Court rules on the motion to withdraw. (Appellant) Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in 10-CV-673 & 10-CV-1334 to October 19, 2011. Appendix, Reply Brief (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte holding Appellee's Motion to Dismiss in Abeyance pending further Order of this court
12/05/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider - of order of 11/22/11 (filed by Kissi) (Appellant)Denied
12/14/2011FiledMotion to stay withdrawal of Atty Ernest P. Francis as Petitioner's Counsel. (Appellant)Denied
12/22/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion to Reconsider order of 11/22/11
12/22/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion to stay withdrawal of Atty Ernest P. Francis as Petitioner's Counsel.
12/22/2011FiledOrder directing appellant Yakima Suipplies to identify counsel within 15 days and to file appellants' reply brief in 10-CV-673 and 10-CV-1334 and appellants' opening brief in 11-CV-195 on or before January 19, 2012.
01/20/2012FiledMotion from aplt against this court's order releasing aplt's attorney E.P. Francis (Appellant)Denied
02/01/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellee)Granted
02/13/2012FiledOpposition to appellee's counsel Ellen B. Flynn's motion to withdrawal (Appellant) David Kissi
02/29/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion from aplt against this court's order releasing aplt's attorney E.P. Francis (Appellant)
02/29/2012FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion to Withdraw (Appellee)
03/12/2012FiledMotion for reconsideration of Court's order dated February 29, 2012 (Appellant)Denied
04/05/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion for reconsideration of Court's order dated February 29, 2012 (Appellant)
05/02/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeals and DENYING Appellee's Motion to Dismiss as MOOT
05/02/2012FiledDismissed
05/24/2012FiledMandate