judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLEMAN (DONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31410
Short Caption:COLEMAN (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR90638Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/09/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/20/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
12/10/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31305, 31309, 31351, 31410, 31434, 31438.
01/15/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived District Court Minutes.
01/15/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
01/15/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/19/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. Regarding Record on Appeal (received the original only).
02/22/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Supplement Petitioner's Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Subjiciendum or the Alternative Supplemental Brief. (Received the original and 2 copies-1 copy returned to Appellant).
02/07/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Washoe County Clerk requesting the transmission of a supplemental record on appeal. 01-02514
02/09/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-02703
02/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn10[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-10100
07/16/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10348
07/16/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2001. 01-10348