judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1235-89
PD-1235-89
09/07/1989
PDR Case Type
CLAY, TOMMY DEWAYNE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/29/1989FINAL DISPRefused
12/13/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/10/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/11/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clay, Tommy DewayneApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Tommy Dewayne Clay
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn W. Smith
Court of Appeals Information:
08-88-00234-CR
Aff 7-19-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
358th District Court
Ector
Honorable BILL MCCOY
D-19,181