judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: AP-70,909
AP-70,909
09/07/1989
Appeal Case Type
KUNKLE, EX PARTE TROY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1993WRIT OF CERT USSCDENIED
06/07/1993WRIT OF CERT USSCFiled
06/02/1993Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
06/02/1993MANDATE ISSD
03/08/1993STAY MANDAT MOT TOGranted
03/05/1993STAY MANDAT MOT TOFiled
03/03/1993REHEAR DISPDENIED
03/03/1993REHEAR DISPDENIED
02/16/1993REHEAR FILED HC
02/16/1993REHEAR FILED
02/03/1993OPINION ISSDHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
02/03/1993OPINION ISSDHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
02/03/1993OPINION ISSDHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
10/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
10/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
10/25/1989SUBMITTED
09/08/1989SUPP BR MOT TOGranted
09/08/1989SUPP BR MOT TOGranted
09/07/1989WRIT FILED
09/07/1989WRIT FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/09/1999STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
KUNKLE, EX PARTE TROYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Richard W. Rogers, III
STATE OF TEXASStateCarlos Valdez
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
28th District Court
Nueces
Honorable ERIC BROWN
87-CR-1022-A