judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1239-89
PD-1239-89
09/07/1989
PDR Case Type
ROACH, SIMON DEAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/10/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ROACH, SIMON DEANApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Kay Davis
STATE OF TEXASStateDanny Hill
Court of Appeals Information:
07-88-00082-CR
Aff 7-31-89
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
251st District Court
Potter
Honorable Naomi Harney
26,305-C