judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00828-CR
14-89-00828-CR
09/07/1989
All Misdemeanors
Reed, Charles Dale
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/1991Case stored
08/21/1991Mandate Issued
08/21/1991Mandate Issued
06/27/1991Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
06/13/1991Misc motion DISPOSEDGRANTED
06/05/1991Misc Motion filed
05/13/1991Writ of Certiorari DISPOSEDDENIED
04/04/1991Writ of certiorari FILED
03/21/1991Motion to stay mandate DISPOSED - ANTGRANTED
03/14/1991Motion to stay mandate FILED - ANT
02/14/1991Motion to stay mandate DISPOSED - ANTGRANTED
02/11/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
01/30/1991Motion to stay mandate FILED - ANT
01/10/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/15/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
10/08/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/06/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
07/12/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/03/1990Ext.time file suppl.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
05/03/1990Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
05/01/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
05/01/1990Submitted
04/30/1990Ext.time file supple.brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP
04/27/1990Supplement brief RECEIVED-ANT,APE
04/04/1990Submission
03/27/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/27/1990Case ready to be set
03/27/1990Case ready to be set
03/08/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/27/1990Exhibits FILED
02/26/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/15/1990Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
02/15/1990Order Entered
02/06/1990Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
01/29/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Motion as to brief length DISPOSED-APP,STAGRANTED
01/17/1990No description available.
01/16/1990Motion as to brief length FILED-APP,STA
01/16/1990Motion as to brief length FILED-APP,STA
01/11/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
01/11/1990No description available.
01/04/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
12/29/1989No description available.
12/29/1989No description available.
12/14/1989Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
12/07/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
12/07/1989Order Entered
12/05/1989Amended motion FILED - ANT,APE,APP,REL,RES,STA
12/04/1989Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
11/30/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
11/30/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/09/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/06/1989Amended motion FILED - ANT,APE,APP,REL,RES,STA
10/31/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/27/1989Transcript FILED
10/05/1989Motion to consolidate DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/02/1989Motion to consolidate FILED-ANT,APE,APP
09/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/01/1989Date of Sentence
09/01/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantRichard W. Schmude
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger A. Haseman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 5
Harris
891,6760
Fine $1000/90 days HCJ