judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1242-89
PD-1242-89
09/07/1989
PDR Case Type
GRANTHAM, HAROLD DOUGLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/10/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/16/1990FINAL DISPRefused
03/16/1990FINAL DISPRefused
02/28/1990PDR DISPRefused
02/28/1990PDR DISPRefused
10/10/1989RESPONSE FILED
10/06/1989PDR FILED
09/07/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/26/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
Grantham, Harold DouglasApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Harold Douglas Grantham
James M. Stanley
Court of Appeals Information:
02-86-00093-CR
Aff 7-27-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 1
Tarrant
Honorable Toby Goldsmith
0245810D