judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00834-CV
14-89-00834-CV
09/07/1989
Miscellaneous civil
First National Bank of Bellaire, Et Al
University Savings Association
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/20/1989Case stored
10/12/1989Mandate Issued
10/12/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
10/12/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/12/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
10/12/1989Mandate Issued
10/11/1989Submitted
10/11/1989Submission
10/11/1989Submitted
09/28/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
09/21/1989Motion to DISPOSED on Bill of ExceptionsOVERRULED
09/07/1989Motion to extend time to obtain Bill of Exceptions
09/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/10/1989Motion for new trial FILED
06/09/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeJames H. Leeland
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantPeter J. O'Loughlin
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
81-51560