judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5550
B-5550
09/30/1975
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF FARMERS BRANCH, ET AL.
AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/19/1976Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/17/1976Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/09/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/08/1976Errata FiledPetitioner
03/08/1976Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/16/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/29/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/13/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
09/30/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/11/1979Document received (See Remarks)
10/04/1976Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
03/19/1976Supplemental Brief filed
03/17/1976Response to Brief filed
03/09/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/08/1976Errata Filed
03/08/1976Brief in Support of Petition
03/05/1976Opinion issued
02/16/1976Reply to Response
02/11/1976Document received (See Remarks)
02/11/1976Document received (See Remarks)
02/11/1976Document received (See Remarks)
02/03/1976Response to Motion filed
01/29/1976Motion for RehearingFiling granted
10/13/1975Response to Petition
09/30/1975Document received (See Remarks)
09/30/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus Curiae
American Honda Motor Co., Inc.Respondent
City of Farmers Branch, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information