Case Information: 60632 | |||
Short Caption: | WERNER VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A654322 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | Exempt | |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/22/2013 | How Submitted: | On Record And Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/10/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | ||
04/10/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 12-11369 | |
04/10/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | 12-11373 | |
04/10/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | 12-11376 | |
04/19/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Corey B. Beck. Check no. 6791. | ||
04/19/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.) | 12-12642 | |
04/20/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel F. Polsenberg and Joel D. Henriod of Lewis and Roca appearing on behalf of respondent Bank of America). | 12-12704 | |
04/23/2012 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | 12-12857 | |
04/27/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 12-13399 | |
05/16/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 12-15585 | |
05/16/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Re: Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 12-15634 | |
05/22/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Conditional Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 500 due: 15 days or Case Appeal Statement due: 11 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) | 12-16114 | |
05/29/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 12-16762 | |
09/06/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. | 12-28252 | |
09/28/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant shall have until October 5, 2012, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | 12-30709 | |
10/10/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 12-32170 | |
10/10/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 12-32171 | |
11/07/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. | 12-35203 | |
11/07/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: December 10, 2012. | 12-35217 | |
12/11/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. | 12-38849 | |
12/13/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent: Answering brief due: December 24, 2012. | 12-39322 | |
12/24/2012 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 12-40570 | |
01/04/2013 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Answering Brief. | 13-00336 | |
01/04/2013 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | ||
02/22/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. | 13-05681 | |
02/22/2013 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/15/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP13-MG/MD/NS. | 13-07903 | |
04/12/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 13-10911 | |
04/12/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/26/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 19, 2013. | 13-10911 |