judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9010
C-9010
08/30/1989
See former TRAP 130(D)
WILLIE HUNTER JR.
UNITED BRANDS INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/25/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/02/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
10/11/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
09/28/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/25/1989No description available.
09/25/1989Reply to Response
09/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/30/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling granted
08/30/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/02/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CHIQUITA BRANDS, INC.RespondentMr. Martin Mayo
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 06-01-89
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable PAUL C. MURPHY
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Richard Millard
82-28579