judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01015-CV
05-89-01015-CV
08/29/1989
Contract
Sunbelt Savings Federal Savings Bank
Amor Bhattacharya d/b/a Raja Trading Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/09/2000Record RetentionDestroy
10/22/1990Mandate Issued
10/22/1990Mandate Issued
08/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/16/1990Submission
05/16/1990Submitted
05/16/1990Submission
05/16/1990Submitted
03/21/1990MattConv
01/17/1990Brief Filed
01/17/1990Case ready to be set
01/17/1990Case ready to be set
01/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/18/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/16/1989Brief Filed
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/15/1989MattConv
09/15/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/15/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
08/29/1989Transcript Filed
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/16/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/17/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
219th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Curt B. Henderson
219-1408-88