judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9011
C-9011
08/30/1989
App Writ of Error
COMERICA BANK-TEXAS
FIRST CITY BANK EAST DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/30/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/02/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksENTIRE COA RECORD, EXCEPT JUDGMENT
01/02/1990Record returned to Court of Appeals
11/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
09/14/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/14/1989No description available.
09/13/1989Reply to Response
08/30/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/02/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GRAND BANKPetitionerMr. Stanley M. Kaufman
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01215-CV
Reversed & Rendered
Rule 90, 06-12-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable JOE BURNETT
Trial Court Information
116th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
87-13062-7