judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9005
C-9005
08/29/1989
App Writ of Error
BONNIE MAE MABE ALEXANDER
WILLIAM T. GREEN III and GLENN W. PATTERSON JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent12 COPIES ANT BR & ANT REP BR
08/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/08/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
12/06/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
09/14/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/14/1989No description available.
09/11/1989Reply to Response12 COPIES ANT BR & ANT REP BR
08/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/08/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00306-CV
Reversed & Rendered
Rule 90, 05-18-89
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable SAM BASS
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
84-69396